Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Benoit-Jules de Béthizy

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1744BornMézières
Jul 1769³24.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 177935.2SelectedBishop of Uzés, France
13 Dec 177935.3ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
16 Jan 178035.4Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
8 Aug 181773.0DiedBishop of Uzés, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Benoit-Jules de Béthizy:
Bishop Henri-Benoit-Jules de Béthizy (born , died ) Bishop of Uzés

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 428
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015