Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gioacchino Cardinal Besozzi, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1679Born
9 Sep 174363.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174363.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
7 Dec 174464.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
25 Mar 174767.2AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
18 Jun 175575.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Besozzi (VIAF: 46544187)
Gioacchino Cardinal Besozzi O. Cist. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceTivoli, Diocese of Tivoli, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Croce in Gerusalem, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017