Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Bertani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fano

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1501BornNonatola
28 Nov 153736.1AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
20 Nov 155150.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155150.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
8 Mar 155856.3DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bertani:
Cardinal Pietro Bertani O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013