Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolo Berruti (Berruto), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1385AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
9 Sep 1394AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
26 Nov 1404AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1406¹DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolo Berruti (Berruto)
Archbishop Nicolo Berruti (Berruto) O.P. (died 1406) Archbishop of Oristano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 102, and Page 480
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 329
  • b: CB, 19 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast