Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1361AppointedBishop of Ploaghe, Italy
12 Jan 1368AppointedArchbishop of Torres, Italy
8 Feb 1369AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo
Archbishop Bernardo , Archbishop of Cagliari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 504, and Page 157
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 403

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast