Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Berniacovich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}

Administrator of Smederevo (Semendria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornBosnen
20 Dec 167528.0AppointedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
31 May 167931.4AppointedAdministrator of Smederevo (Semendria), Serbia
10 Jan 170759.0DiedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Berniacovich:
Bishop Matteo Berniacovich O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 117, and Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013