Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Bernetti

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1779Born
2 Oct 182646.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 182747.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
17 Jun 182848.4AppointedSecretary of State
10 Feb 182949.1ResignedSecretary of State
21 Feb 183151.1AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
10 Aug 183151.6AppointedSecretary of State
20 Jan 183656.0ResignedSecretary of State
1839²59.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 184464.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
21 Mar 185272.2DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Bernetti (VIAF: 89061050)
Tommaso Cardinal Bernetti (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Death PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy

  • a priest for 13.2 years
  • a cardinal for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1826
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast