Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni M. Bernasconi, B. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Clerics Regular of St. Paul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1910BornPogliano Milanese
27 Mar 193726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
196453.4AppointedSuperior General of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
197665.4ResignedSuperior General of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
22 May 198675.8DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Clerics Regular of St. Paul

MicroData Summary for Giovanni M. Bernasconi:
Father Giovanni M. Bernasconi B. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Clerics Regular of St. Paul

  • a priest for 49.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015