Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marino de’ Bernardini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1424AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
23 Feb 1428AppointedBishop of Modon (Medone, Methone), Greece
25 Sep 1430AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
16 Mar 1452DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

MicroData Summary for Marino de’ Bernardini
Archbishop Marino de’ Bernardini O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 209, and Page 352
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast