Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Berarducci, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1616³Born
5 Apr 164225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 May 169073.8AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
25 Sep 169579.1DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Berarducci
Bishop Ippolito Berarducci O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigevano

  • a priest for 53.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,690, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast