Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bennio (de Butrio), O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1598AppointedBishop of Scala, Italy
30 Jul 1603AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
19 Jan 1617DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bennio (de Butrio)
Bishop Francesco Bennio (de Butrio) O.S.M. (died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018