Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Bellew

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1746³Born
15 Mar 177124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
18 Dec 177933.5AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
3 Apr 178033.8Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
16 Jun 181367.0DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic Bellew
Bishop Dominic Bellew (born , died ) Bishop of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux, France
Ordained BishopBrussels
Death PlaceMullingar
Buried Place (Original)Abbey, Moyne, Diocese of Killala

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 42
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op/loc: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 2, and Page 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast