Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard de Bellevue (St. Léger)

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1223AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
27 Aug 1223Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
4 Apr 1236DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Richard de Bellevue (St. Léger)
Bishop Richard de Bellevue (St. Léger) (died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 31 May 2020

Quantcast