Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René du Bellay de Langey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
19 Jul 153232.5AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
1533¹33.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Grasse, France
13 Aug 153535.6AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
23 Jan 153636.0Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
1 Nov 1542¹42.8ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
Aug 1546³46.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René du Bellay de Langey
Bishop René du Bellay de Langey (born 1500, died Aug 1546) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162, and Page 205
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018