Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustache du Bellay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1551AppointedBishop of Paris, France
15 Nov 1551Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
1564¹ResignedBishop of Paris, France
4 Sep 1565DiedBishop Emeritus of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustache du Bellay
Bishop Eustache du Bellay (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-le-Rond, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,216
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018