Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Beliardi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1560AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy
13 Mar 1560AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
13 Apr 1562DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Beliardi
Bishop Girolamo Beliardi (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Parma

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 19*
  • d: CB, 31 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast