Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bento de Beja Noronha

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1634³Born
22 Mar 167237.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 169459.9AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
30 Nov 170066.0DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bento de Beja Noronha
Bishop Bento de Beja Noronha (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,695, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast