Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christopherus (Edmund) Becker, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Assam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1875Born
23 Oct 189116.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
17 Apr 189822.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
190630.1AppointedPrefect of Assam, India
192145.1ResignedPrefect of Assam, India
30 Mar 193761.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Assam, India

MicroData Summary for Christopherus (Edmund) Becker
Father Christopherus (Edmund) Becker S.D.S. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Assam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsloff

  • a priest for 38.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018