Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertolino Beccari, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1405AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
25 Jan 1406Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
18 Jul 1417DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bertolino Beccari:
Bishop Bertolino Beccari O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a bishop for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 83
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013