Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Albrecht Sigmund von Bayern

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Freising

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1623BornMünchen
17 Apr 164016.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
3 Mar 164218.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
8 Dec 165128.3SucceededBishop of Freising, Germany
30 Jul 166845.0SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Jun 166945.8ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
5 Nov 168562.3DiedBishop-Elect of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albrecht Sigmund von Bayern:
Priest Albrecht Sigmund von Bayern (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Freising

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013