Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simón Vicente Bauzá, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1552³BornPalma de Mallorca
7 Jan 160855.9AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
11 Jun 160856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
5 Dec 162573.8DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simón Vicente Bauzá:
Bishop Simón Vicente Bauzá O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 228
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013