Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ludwig Baumeister, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Shihtsien [Shiqian]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1894BornDülmen, Germany
192126.5ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
9 Aug 192531.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
11 Nov 193238.4AppointedSuperior of Shihtsien [Shiqian], China
2 Dec 193743.4ResignedSuperior of Shihtsien [Shiqian], China
4 Aug 194652.1DiedSuperior Emeritus of Shihtsien [Shiqian], China

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Baumeister:
Priest Ludwig Baumeister M.S.C. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Shihtsien [Shiqian]

  • a priest for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013