Catholic-Hierarchy DC

András Cardinal Bathóry

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566²Born
4 Jul 158418.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 158418.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
28 Jul 158418.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
7 Jan 158721.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
23 Mar 158923.2SucceededBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
28 Oct 159933.8DiedBishop-Elect of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for András Bathóry (VIAF: 25658196)
András Cardinal Bathóry (born 1566, died ) Bishop-Elect of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzilágy-Somlyo
Death PlaceCsíkszentdomonkos
Buried Place (Original)Alba Iulia, Diocese of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

  • a cardinal for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Jul 1584
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018