Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Saverio Basile

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Reggio Calabria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1808Born
20 May 183122.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187163.2AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
26 Dec 187163.2DiedArchbishop-Elect of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Basile
Father Francesco Saverio Basile (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasole

  • a priest for 40.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 480
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018