Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Barugi

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629BornFulginaten
25 Mar 166233.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 168859.9AppointedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
May 170879.3DiedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Petrus Barugi:
Bishop Petrus Barugi Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013