Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lope Barrientos, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1382²BornMedina del Campo
21 Feb 143856.1AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
19 Jul 144159.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
7 Apr 144563.2AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
30 May 146987.4DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lope Barrientos:
Bishop Lope Barrientos O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234, and Page 78
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 307, Number 185
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015