Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Luca Barranco, O. de M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Arequipa

Titular Bishop of Carpasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1792BornArequipa
8 Jan 186673.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
8 Jan 186673.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
22 Apr 1866³73.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Luca Barranco:
Priest Giuseppe Luca Barranco O. de M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Arequipa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013