Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Barreiros, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1575AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
15 Aug 1576InstalledBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
11 May 1600DiedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Barreiros
Bishop Antônio Barreiros O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortugal

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 13*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast