Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Berardo Barracciu, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1884Born
189914.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Jan 190722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
26 Feb 193247.5AppointedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
3 Sep 194056.1DiedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

MicroData Summary for Berardo Barracciu
Father Berardo Barracciu O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Prefect of Ankang [Hinganfu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAristanei, Archdiocese of Cagliari, Italy
Death PlaceHinangfu, Prefecture Apostolic of Ankang [Hinganfu]

  • a priest for 33.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast