Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino Barradas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹BornLisboa
23 Sep 160252.7AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
2 Feb 160353.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
Jun 1618³68.4ResignedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
1 Sep 161868.6DiedBishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Constantino Barradas:
Bishop Constantino Barradas (born 1550, died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,158
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015