Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Barni

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1651³Born
2 Nov 168736.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 168837.2AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
31 Aug 173180.5DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Barni
Bishop Giorgio Barni (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 317
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018