Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Barnaba

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1574AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
17 Aug 1579AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
19 Jun 1606DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Barnaba
Bishop Sebastiano Barnaba (died ) Bishop of Potenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216, and Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018