Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Barnabó

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1801Born
Mar 1833³31.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 184746.3AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
13 Aug 184847.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
16 Jun 185655.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jun 185655.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
20 Jun 185655.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
24 Feb 187472.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Barnabó (VIAF: 52432532)
Alessandro Cardinal Barnabó (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)del suburbano, Church, Foligno, Diocese of Foligno, Italy

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jun 1856

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast