Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Bargagli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1670³Born
22 Feb 170635.7AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
30 Jun 172959.1DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Bargagli
Bishop Gaetano Maria Bargagli O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienna

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018