Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Barrionuevo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Nov 1566AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
1567¹Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
26 Jul 1571DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Barrionuevo
Bishop Fernando de Barrionuevo O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Spain
Death PlaceSantiago, Diocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a bishop for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 78, Number 464
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 24
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018