Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Barbier, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1476AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
3 Apr 1476AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
30 Jun 1476Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
28 Mar 1494DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Gilles Barbier
Bishop Gilles Barbier O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBruges, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 230
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,459
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast