Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Barbosa de Eša

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹Born
9 Jun 163642.4AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
7 Sep 163642.6Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
3 Dec 164046.9DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Barbosa de Eša
Bishop Pedro Barbosa de Eša (born 1594, died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,636, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast