Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Inácio Barbosa Accioly, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1913BornSão Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
19 Dec 194229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Oct 196956.3SelectedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Nov 196956.4ConfirmedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
26 May 199278.9DiedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Inácio Barbosa Accioly:
Abbot Inácio Barbosa Accioly O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 49.4 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013