Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Bandini Piccolomini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
7 Apr 152924.2AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
25 Oct 153833.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
28 May 158883.4DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bandini Piccolomini (VIAF: 85055027)
Archbishop Francesco Bandini Piccolomini (born 1505, died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 49.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,456
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018