Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bandello Cardinal Bandelli

Deceased

Administrator of Rimini, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹Born
15 Jul 138737.5AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
16 Sep 138737.7InstalledBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
14 Mar 140757.2AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
19 Sep 140858.7AppointedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
19 Sep 140858.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 140858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
Oct 1416³66.7DiedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bandello Bandelli
Bandello Cardinal Bandelli (born 1350, died Oct 1416) Administrator of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca
Death PlaceConstance

  • a cardinal for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 191, and Page 107
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast