Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ballati-Nerli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1657Born
1 May 168123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Sep 170447.2AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
21 Sep 170447.2Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
28 Mar 174890.7DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ballati-Nerli
Bishop Domenico Ballati-Nerli O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163
  • ob: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,815
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018