Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Clément Bąkiewicz

Deceased

Priest of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1760³BornChmielnik
5 Dec 178424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
2 Jan 184281.0DiedPriest of Kraków, Poland
24 Jan 184281.1AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Clément Bąkiewicz
Father Clément Bąkiewicz (born , died ) Priest of Kraków

  • a priest for 57.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 333
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016