Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Badia, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1483BornModena, Italy
2 Jun 154258.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 154258.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
6 Sep 154763.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Badia:
Cardinal Tommaso Badia O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013