Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Basso Della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434²BornAlbizzola
14 Feb 147238.1AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
5 Oct 147642.8AppointedBishop of Macerata, Italy
10 Dec 147743.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147743.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
17 Sep 147945.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
23 Sep 148248.7AppointedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
9 Jan 149258.0ResignedAdministrator of Gubbio, Italy
31 Aug 149258.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
29 Nov 150369.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1 Sep 150773.7DiedBishop of Macerata, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Basso Della Rovere:
Cardinal Girolamo Basso Della Rovere (died ) Bishop of Macerata

  • a cardinal for 29.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013