Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Baden

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434Born
21 Jun 145622.4SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
25 Oct 145622.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
Apr 1465³31.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
9 Feb 150268.1DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Baden
Archbishop Johann von Baden (born 1434, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaden-Baden
Ordained BishopChâteau, Sarrebruck

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 255
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,472
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1465, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast