Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Joseph Leopold Willibald von Baden

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1740³BornMannheim
25 Mar 177938.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
3 Apr 177938.7Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Jul 177939.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Jul 177939.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
9 Jun 179857.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Joseph Leopold Willibald von Baden
Bishop Wilhelm Joseph Leopold Willibald von Baden (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 19.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016