Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Teofilo Emilio de Backere, C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Surabaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1882BornEede, Netherlands
5 Jun 190927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jun 192846.0AppointedPrefect of Surabaia, Indonesia
24 Dec 193654.6ResignedPrefect of Surabaia, Indonesia
4 Jul 1945¹63.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Surabaia, Indonesia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teofilo Emilio de Backere:
Priest Teofilo Emilio de Backere C.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Surabaia

  • a priest for 36.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013