Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Bacchetoni

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1690BornPreci
8 Jan 171322.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 173746.2AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
1 Dec 174959.0AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
30 Aug 176776.8DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Bacchetoni:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Bacchetoni (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 54.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1766
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 81, and Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013