Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pires de Azevedo Loureiro

Deceased

Bishop of Beja, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1777Born
28 Nov 180225.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 184366.3SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
22 Jan 184466.8ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
26 May 184467.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
26 Sep 184871.5DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pires de Azevedo Loureiro
Bishop Manuel Pires de Azevedo Loureiro (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoreira de Santar

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 107
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,052
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast