Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo de Azevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1698³Born
30 May 174850.3SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
15 Jul 174850.5ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
3 Nov 174850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
19 Dec 174850.9InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
11 Nov 176567.8DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo de Azevedo
Bishop Joćo de Azevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBraga

  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017